WV HB2540 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the "Travel Insurance Model Act," set requirements for policies, allow rulemaking and enforcement for the Commissioner, setting standards for policies and pricing.
Title
Travel Insurance Model Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 601) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 627) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 130) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 627) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 130) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 601) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 627) |
2023-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 130) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-13 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 12 | 32b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 62 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |