WV HB2539 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the Marshall University Forensic Science Center as the state designated laboratory for DNA typing, testing and research in support of CODIS and forensic DNA testing.
Title
Authorizing the West Virginia State Police to enter into agreements for certain forensic services with the Marshall University Forensic Science Center
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Brown [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. John Ellem [R] | Del. John Frazier [D] |
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Linda Longstreth [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] |
Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 160, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/21/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/21/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 462) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-11 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-11 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 12) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-11 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-02 | House Message received | |
2011-02-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 30) | |
2011-02-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-01 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-01-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-01-31 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-01-28 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2011-01-27 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-18 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-18 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB194 (Same As) 2011-01-28 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |