WV HB2521 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to permit fur-bearer parts, including, but is not limited to, glands, skulls, urine, essence, claws, baculum and meat of game or fur-bearing animals, and the hides and tails of squirrels to be sold, traded or bartered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to permitting fur-bearer parts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 146) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 58) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseChapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-01HouseApproved by Governor 2/28/19 - House Journal
2019-03-01SenateApproved by Governor 2/28/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-28HouseApproved by Governor 2/28/19
2019-02-22HouseTo Governor 2/22/19
2019-02-22HouseTo Governor 2/22/19 - House Journal
2019-02-22SenateTo Governor 2/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-18HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-02-15SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-02-15SenateCommunicated to House
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 146)
2019-02-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-13SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-13SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-12SenateReported do pass
2019-02-01SenateTo Natural Resources
2019-02-01SenateTo Natural Resources
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-31HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-31HousePassed House (Roll No. 58)
2019-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-31HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-30HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-18HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-18HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
2019-01-18HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20211Amended CodeCitation Text
20212Amended CodeCitation Text
20249Amended CodeCitation Text
29211Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback