WV HB2521 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-04 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-04 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the scope, application and methods for error correction required by the CPRB as it relates to PERS, DSRS, MPFRS, TRS, TDC Plan, State Police (Plan A), State Police (Plan B) and JRS.
Title
Clarifying the scope, application and methods for error correction required by the CPRB
Sponsors
Del. Denny Canterbury [R] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Michael Folk [R] | Del. Ron Walters [R] |
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] | Del. Kenneth Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 304) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-03-04 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 304) |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-30 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 2A | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5V | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 14c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 14 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 14A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 14D | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |