WV HB2519 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to allow a person who holds a current and valid license to carry a concealed deadly weapon to carry such a weapon on the campus and in the buildings of a state institution of higher education. It provides exceptions and immunity to an institution for a licensee’s intentional or unintentional use of a firearm while carrying it under the act. The bill seeks to acknowledge that violence against disarmed law-abiding citizens is an increasing, but unnecessary, occurrence. The bill is an attempt by the Legislature to reaffirm a law-abiding citizen's Second Amendment Right, the right to protect themselves by allowing legally licensed and permitted employees, staff, and students of public universities the right to legally carry a concealed weapon within specified limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Campus Self Defense Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - Effective July 1, 2099 rejected (Roll No. 387) (Y: 31 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 386) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 385) (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 384) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 383) (Y: 38 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 382) (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 381) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 380) (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 379) (Y: 45 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 378) (Y: 34 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 377) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 376) (Y: 33 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion to limit debate adopted (Roll No. 375) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion to suspend rule and reject all pending amendments rejected (Roll No. 374) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion to place on Special Calendar rejected (Roll No. 356) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - Shall the bill be rejected on 1st reading (Roll No. 306) (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - 2nd reference rejected (Roll No. 217) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2019-03-01SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-03-01SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-27HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-27HouseEffective July 1, 2099 rejected (Roll No. 387)
2019-02-27HousePassed House (Roll No. 386)
2019-02-27HouseMotion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 385)
2019-02-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-27HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No 384)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 383)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 382)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 381)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 380)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 379)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 378)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 377)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Voice vote)
2019-02-27HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 376)
2019-02-27HouseMotion to limit debate adopted (Roll No. 375)
2019-02-27HouseMotion to suspend rule and reject all pending amendments rejected (Roll No. 374)
2019-02-27HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-27HousePlaced on Special Calender
2019-02-27HouseHouse refused to reconsider
2019-02-27HouseMotion to place on Special Calendar rejected (Roll No. 356)
2019-02-27HousePlaced on House Calendar
2019-02-27HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-26HouseAmendments pending
2019-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-26HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-25HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-25HouseShall the bill be rejected on 1st reading (Roll No. 306)
2019-02-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-22HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-02-21HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-21HouseCommitted to Finance on 1st reading
2019-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-20House2nd reference rejected (Roll No. 217)
2019-02-20HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-18HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-18HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-18HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18B13Amended CodeCitation Text
18B16Amended CodeCitation Text
18B1B4Amended CodeCitation Text
18B2A4Amended CodeCitation Text
18B2B6Amended CodeCitation Text
18B45bNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2519&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2519%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2519
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2519%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2519
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2519%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2519
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00306.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00356.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00374.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00375.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00376.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00377.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00378.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00379.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00380.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00381.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00382.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00383.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00384.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00385.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00386.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00387.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback