WV HB2512 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 127, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 127, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reform the Medicaid subrogation statute. The bill reorganizes the statute, clarifies the departments subrogation right, and provides a twenty-one day notification requirement upon actions, claims or settlement offers affecting the departments subrogation right. The bill creates civil penalties for violations of the notice requirement in the amount of $1,000 per day, up to $50,000 or the amount of past medical expenses at issue, whichever is greater. The bill requires any settlement or judgment of a claim against a third party to be allocated to include past medical expenses and approved by either the department or a judicial body.
Title
Reforming the state Medicaid subrogation statute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 406) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 106) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 106) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 127, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 406) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 106) |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB180 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |