WV HB2465 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to modify the requirements that allow a child witness to testify by closed circuit television.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the requirements that allow a child witness to testify by closed circuit television

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 16) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-24SenateTo Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateTo Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-02-24SenateHouse Message received
2017-02-23HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-02-23HousePassed House (Roll No. 16)
2017-02-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-02-23HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2017-02-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-02-22HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2017-02-21HouseRead 1st time
2017-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2017-02-20HouseBy substitute, do pass
2017-02-15HouseTo House Judiciary
2017-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2017-02-15HouseTo Judiciary
2017-02-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB48 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
626B2Amended CodeCitation Text
626B3Amended CodeCitation Text
626B4Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback