WV HB2453 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the list of persons the Commissioner of Agriculture may license to grow or cultivate industrial hemp.
Title
Expanding the list of persons the Commissioner of Agriculture may license to grow or cultivate industrial hemp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 376) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 212) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 212) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 376) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Government Organization |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 212) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-15 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |