WV HB2419 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2419
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify misdemeanor bail requirements. The bill requires a court or magistrate to release a person charged with certain misdemeanor offenses on his or her own recognizance except for good cause shown. The bill also sets forth exceptions when a person may not be released on his or her own recognizance. Â
Title
Relating to the authorization to release a defendant or a person arrested upon his or her own recognizance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 740) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 572) (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 54) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 51) (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 572) (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 54) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 51) (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 740) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Weld Title amendment adopted |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Judiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 572) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Plymale Amendment to committee amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Trump Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20 with right to amend, amendment pending |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 54) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 51) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2419 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1C | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |