WV HB2403 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the law governing professional licensing boards in general.
Title
Updating the law governing professional licensing boards in general
Sponsors
Del. Sam Argento [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] |
Del. Dale Martin [D] | Del. Carol Miller [R] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-27 | To Government Organization | |
2009-02-27 | To Government Organization | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-02-26 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 12) | |
2009-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 11) | |
2009-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-02-26 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2009-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-02-25 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2009-02-24 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2009-02-23 | Do pass | |
2009-02-13 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced in House | |
2009-02-13 | To Government Organization | |
2009-02-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
30 | 1 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 1 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 1 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2403&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |