WV HB2399 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 124, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 124, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a procedure to protect livestock that are in dire or extreme condition.
Title
Protecting livestock in dire or extreme condition
Sponsors
Del. Daniel Poling [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Michael Manypenny [D] | Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] |
Del. Lynwood Ireland [R] | Del. John Ellem [R] | Del. Randal Swartzmiller [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 405) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 9) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 147) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 9) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 147) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 124, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 405) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 9) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 147) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | To House Agriculture |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-13 | House | To Agriculture then Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 18 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 7R | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 18 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 1C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |