WV HB2397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2397
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require county school boards to provide adequate mental health and counseling services in the form of the employment of a psychologist or psychiatrist to pupils to address issues stemming from drug abuse.
Title
Requiring county school boards to provide adequate mental health and counseling services
Sponsors
Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. John Kelly [R] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Del. John Mandt [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 359) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 359) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/19 |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Education |
2019-01-14 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-14 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Education |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2397 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 22e | New Code | See Bill Text |