WV HB2378 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enter West Virginia into an interstate compact known as the Agreement Among the states to Elect the President by National Popular Vote. Under the compact, the state agrees to award its electoral votes to the presidential ticket that receives the most popular votes in all 50 states and the District of Columbia. The compact goes into effect when states cumulatively possessing a majority of the electoral votes have joined the compact.
Title
Agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-21 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-12 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-12 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB322 (Same As) 2011-01-27 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 13 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 1D | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |