WV HB2360 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to place the Athletic Commission under the Lottery Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Placing the Athletic Commission under the Lottery Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-25SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-25SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-24HousePassed House (Roll No. 18)
2019-01-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-24HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-22HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-14HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-14HouseTo Government Organization
2019-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295A1aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback