WV HB2294 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
10.0pt;color:black'>The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Treasurer's Office to promulgate a legislative rule relating to the Procedure for Fees in Collections by Charge, Credit or Debit Card or by Electronic Payment.
Title
Treasurer’s Office, W.Va. State Procedure for Fees in Collections by Charge, Credit or Debit Card or by Electronic Payment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219 |
2017-02-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | To House Finance |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-09 | House | To Finance then Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB157 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |