WV HB2263 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add language to the West Virginia Code to provide guidance for prosecuting attorneys in cases involving abused and neglected children.
Title
Providing guidance for prosecuting attorneys in cases involving abused and neglected children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 337) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | Senate | Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Motion |
2015-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 337) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 7 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |