WV HB2221 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exclude certain life insurance proceeds and contractual instruments from attachment during bankruptcy proceedings.
Title
Relating to bankruptcy
Sponsors
Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Andy Shamblin [R] |
Del. Rick Hillenbrand [R] | Del. Larry Kump [R] | Del. Joey Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 582) (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 56, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 582) |
2023-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/2023 with right to amend |
2023-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-01-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-01-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 45) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |