WV HB2213 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reduce the deposit of excess lottery proceeds into the Infrastructure Fund from $40 million to $30 million for fiscal year 2016 and to increase the percentage of such funds in the Infrastructure Fund which may be used to make grants from twenty percent to fifty percent for fiscal year 2016.
Title
Reducing the distributions to the West Virginia Infrastructure Fund
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 7) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 406) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 405) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 23) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 92) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 79) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - Advance bill with amendment pending rejected (Roll No. 78) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 7) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 406) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 405) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 23) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 92) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 79) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - Advance bill with amendment pending rejected (Roll No. 78) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 7) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 406) |
2015-03-10 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 405) |
2015-03-10 | House | Conference report received-House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2015-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-06 | House | To conference |
2015-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | House appointed conferees: Nelson, E., Anderson, Boggs |
2015-03-06 | House | House agreed to conference |
2015-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: M. Hall, Walters, Prezioso |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2015-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 23) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/24/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2015-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) |
2015-02-17 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 92) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 79) |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-02-16 | House | Advance bill with amendment pending rejected (Roll No. 78) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2015-01-22 | House | To House Finance |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-22 | House | To Finance |
2015-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB265 (Same As) 2015-01-20 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22 | 18d | Amended Code | Citation Text |