WV HB2195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 269, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 269, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require law-enforcement officers to submit motor vehicle crash reports to the owners and/or drivers of the vehicles involved in the crash. The bill requires the law-enforcement officer shall, within 24 hours of a motor vehicle crash, share the owner/operator and insurance information for all the involved parties with all the other involved parties and/or their insurance agents. The bill permits replacement or rental provisions to be expedited and victims will not be left without transportation for an extended period while the accident report is being completed.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle crash reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 654) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 482) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 251) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 482) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 251) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 269, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 654) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 482) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 251) |
2021-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB59 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 4 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |