WV HB2174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
West Virginia Monument and Memorial Protection Act of 2021
Title
West Virginia Monument and Memorial Protection Act of 2021
Sponsors
Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Pat McGeehan [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Del. Trenton Barnhart [R] | Del. Caleb Hanna [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 220) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 219) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 218) (Y: 24 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 219) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 218) (Y: 24 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 220) |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 219) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 218) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Amendments pending |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2174 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - To Judiciary