WV HB2167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a Silver Alert program for senior citizens
Title
Creating a Silver Alert program for senior citizens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 91) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 112) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 7) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 112) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 7) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-03-23 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/17 |
2017-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/17 - House Journal |
2017-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/17 |
2017-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/17/17 - House Journal |
2017-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-03-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-15 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-03-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 91) |
2017-03-15 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 112) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 7) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-08 | House | To House Senior Citizen Issues |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-08 | House | To Senior Citizen Issues |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 3B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |