WV HB2095 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2095
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide increased protections for the welfare of domestic animals in the care of animal shelters, breeders, and private individuals.
Title
Providing increased protections for the welfare of domestic animals
Sponsors
Del. Dianna Graves [R] | Del. Larry Rowe [D] | Del. Cody Thompson [D] | Del. Austin Haynes [R] |
Del. Lisa Zukoff [D] | Del. Laura Kimble [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 347) |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Amendment pending |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2095 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 20 | 12a | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 20 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 20 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 20 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8 | 19d | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8 | 19e | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 1 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 10 | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 10 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |