WV HB2083 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the felony criminal penalties for exposing children to methamphetamine manufacturing
Title
Increasing the felony criminal penalties for exposing children to methamphetamine manufacturing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 523) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 391) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 367) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 25) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 391) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 367) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 25) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 44, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 523) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 391) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate requests return of bill from House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 367) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 25) |
2017-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-08 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 10 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |