WV HB2069 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the faculty senate allotment for classroom teachers and librarians from $50 to $100, to be spent on academic materials, supplies or equipment to enhance instruction.
Title
Increasing the faculty senate allotment for classroom teachers and librarians
Sponsors
Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Gerald Crosier [D] | Del. Walter Duke [R] | Del. Ronald Fragale [D] |
Del. Richard Iaquinta [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Mary Poling [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2009-04-07 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 4) | |
2009-04-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 4) | |
2009-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-04-06 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-04-03 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-03 | On 1st reading | |
2009-04-02 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2009-04-02 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-04-02 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2009-02-26 | To Education | |
2009-02-26 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 8) | |
2009-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 7) | |
2009-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-02-25 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-02-24 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2009-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2009-02-23 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2009-02-20 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2009-02-20 | Do pass | |
2009-02-11 | To House Education | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced in House | |
2009-02-11 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2069&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |