WV HB2012 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify public charter schools generally; to provide for a liberal interpretation; to prohibit the conversion of private schools; to prohibit any sort of profit or monetary consideration by elected officials in relation to charter schools; to limit the authorization of public charter school; to create a process by which to appeal the authorizer’s decision to the West Virginia Board of Education; to create virtual public charter schools in West Virginia; to establish the West Virginia Professional Charter School Board; and to provide for members, appointments.
Title
Relating to public charter schools
Sponsors
Del. Doug Smith [R] | Del. Wayne Clark [R] | Del. Laura Kimble [R] | Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] |
Del. Johnnie Wamsley [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 68) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 55) (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Baldwin Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 44) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Committee Amendment as amended adopted (Roll No. 43) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Sypolt's Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 42) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 12) (Y: 25 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 13) (Y: 22 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 11) (Y: 25 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 10) (Y: 24 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 55) (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Baldwin Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 44) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Committee Amendment as amended adopted (Roll No. 43) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Sypolt's Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 42) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 12) (Y: 25 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 13) (Y: 22 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 11) (Y: 25 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 10) (Y: 24 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/11/21 |
2021-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/11/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/11/21- - Senate Journal |
2021-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/21 |
2021-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/5/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/5/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-03 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 68) |
2021-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Rucker Title amendment adopted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Education Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 55) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment reported |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Baldwin Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 44) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment as amended adopted (Roll No. 43) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Sypolt's Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 42) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Education Committee Amendments Reported |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2021-02-17 | Senate | To Education |
2021-02-17 | Senate | To Education |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 17) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 13) |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 12) |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 11) |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 10) |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Education |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Education |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5G | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5G | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5G | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |