WV HB2010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to elect all justices to the West Virginia Supreme Court of Appeals, all circuit court judges, all family court judges and all magistrates on a nonpartisan basis by division.
Title
Requiring the elections of justices of the West Virginia Supreme Court of Appeals, circuit court judges, family court judges and magistrates be nonpartisan and by division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 400) (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 164) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 27) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 25) (Y: 11 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 24) (Y: 31 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - House - House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 400) (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 164) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 27) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 25) (Y: 11 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 24) (Y: 31 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 4) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/6/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-09 | House | House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 400) |
2015-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-09 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2015-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/6/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-06 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/6/15 |
2015-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/2/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-02 | House | To Governor 3/2/15 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | To Governor 3/2/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-23 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 164) |
2015-02-23 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 27) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 25) |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 24) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-02 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-01-30 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-01-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Same As) 2015-01-14 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 1 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 12 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 4A | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 5 | 6b | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 5 | 6c | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 5 | 6d | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 6 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 2A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |