WV HB2009 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 170, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to limitations on the use of wages and agency shop fees by employers and labor organizations for political activities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to limitations on the use of wages and agency shop fees by employers and labor organizations for political activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 211) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 210) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 132) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Romano Amendments to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 127) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 38) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 170, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-03-30HouseApproved by Governor 3/30/21
2021-03-31HouseApproved by Governor 3/30/21 - House Journal
2021-03-31SenateApproved by Governor 3/30/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-24HouseTo Governor 3/24/21
2021-03-25HouseTo Governor 3/24/21 - House Journal
2021-03-24SenateTo Governor 3/24/21 - Senate Journal
2021-03-22SenateHouse Message received
2021-03-19HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-03-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 211)
2021-03-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 210)
2021-03-19HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-03-16SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-03-16SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 132)
2021-03-16SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-16SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-15SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-15SenateRomano Amendments to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 127)
2021-03-15SenateTrump Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-15SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2021-03-15SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-12SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-12SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-11SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2021-02-22SenateTo Judiciary
2021-02-22SenateTo Judiciary
2021-02-22SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-02-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 38)
2021-02-19HouseRead 3rd time
2021-02-19HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-18HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-02-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-02-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-17HouseRead 1st time
2021-02-17HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-02-16HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-02-10HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-10HouseTo Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
211A4Amended CodeCitation Text
2151Amended CodeCitation Text
3812Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2009&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2009%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2009
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2009%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2009
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2009%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2009
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2009%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2009
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2009%20HFA%20CAPITO%202-13%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2009%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1%203-9.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2009%20SFA%20ROMANO%20_1%203-15%20rejected.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2009%20SFA%20TRUMP%203-15%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2009%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1%203-9%20as%20amended.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2009%20SFAT%20TRUMP%203-16%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00038.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-15-0127.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-16-0132.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00210.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00211.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback