WV HB2004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create and maintain a centralized state vehicle inventory system. The bill establishes the Fleet Management Office within the Department of Administration. The bill creates the State Vehicle Title, Registration and Relicensing Project of 2017. The bill requires reporting by spending units utilizing state vehicles. The bill provides the new article’s scope and establishes exemptions. The bill provides for new officers and establishes their powers, duties and responsibilities. The bill defines terms. The bill continues the Fleet Management Office Fund. The bill requires the Fleet Management Office to coordinate with other agencies. The bill provides for annual reports of vehicle use by spending units. The bill requires annual reports to the Governor and the Joint Committee on Government and Finance. The bill establishes operator requirements and training. The bill provides for enforcement. The bill provides for notice. The bill requires legislative compliance audits. The bill provides a deadline date for the expiration of current state vehicle license plates. The bill creates new state vehicle license plates. The bill provides for notice to spending units regarding the expiration of title, registrations and license plates. The bill requires a standardized naming convention for the tile, registration and licensing of all state vehicles. The bill requires annual renewal of the state vehicle registrations. The bill provides exemptions from reporting for certain undercover vehicles. The bill requires insurance cards in state vehicles. The bill authorizes rule making and emergency rule making.
Title
Creating and maintaining a centralized state vehicle inventory system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 193) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 192) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 192) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-28 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 193) |
2017-03-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 192) |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-03-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-22 | House | To House Finance |
2017-02-22 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-20 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2622 (Similar To) 2017-02-21 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 23a | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 3 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 3 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 3 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 12 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29B | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 12 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 49 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |