WV HB2004 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide a procedure for the development of a state plan under section 111(d) of the Clean Air Act. It requires the Department of Environmental Protection to study the feasibility of a state plan and to submit a report to the Legislature determining whether a state plan is feasible, and, if so, recommending a proposed state plan to the Legislature. It also requires the approval of the Legislature before a state plan is submitted to the United States Environmental Protection Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a procedure for the development of a state plan under section 111(d) of the Clean Air Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 109) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 108) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 4) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 40) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15HouseChapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
2015-03-03HouseApproved by Governor 3/3/15
2015-03-05HouseApproved by Governor 3/3/15 - House Journal
2015-03-04SenateApproved by Governor 3/3/15 - Senate Journal
2015-02-26SenateTo Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal
2015-02-25HouseTo Governor 2/25/15
2015-02-25HouseTo Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal
2015-02-20SenateHouse Message received
2015-02-19HouseCompleted legislative action
2015-02-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-02-19HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 109)
2015-02-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 108)
2015-02-19HouseHouse received Senate message
2015-02-18SenateSenate requests House to concur
2015-02-18SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 4)
2015-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 4)
2015-02-18SenateRead 3rd time
2015-02-18SenateOn 3rd reading
2015-02-17SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-02-17SenateRead 2nd time
2015-02-17SenateOn 2nd reading
2015-02-16SenateRead 1st time
2015-02-16SenateOn 1st reading
2015-02-13SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2015-02-09SenateTo Judiciary
2015-02-09SenateTo Judiciary
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2015-02-09SenateHouse Message received
2015-02-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-02-06HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 40)
2015-02-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 39)
2015-02-06HouseRead 3rd time
2015-02-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2015-02-05HouseRead 2nd time
2015-02-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2015-02-04HouseRead 1st time
2015-02-04HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2015-02-03HouseBy substitute, do pass
2015-01-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2015-01-23HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2015-01-14HouseTo House Energy
2015-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2015-01-14HouseTo Energy then Judiciary
2015-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB4 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22520Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2004&year=2015&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2004%20intr.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2004
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2004%20SUB.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2004
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2004%20SUB%20ENR.pdf&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2004
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2004%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=2004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00039.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00040.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/02-18-0004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00108.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00109.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback