WV HB144 | 2023 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Chapter 33, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Chapter 33, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a pilot program to include Potomac State College of West Virginia as an eligible institution for participation in the "Learn and Earn Program."
Title
Including Potomac State College of West Virginia in the definition of community and technical college education program for participation in the “Learn and Earn Program”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 103) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 102) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 815) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 814) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 813) (Y: 80 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-08-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 102) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 815) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 814) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 813) (Y: 80 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-28 | House | Chapter 33, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023 |
2023-08-08 | House | Approved by Governor 8/22/23 - House Journal |
2023-08-22 | House | Approved by Governor 8/22/23 |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 8/22/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-08-08 | Senate | To Governor 8/10/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-08-08 | House | To Governor 8/10/23 - House Journal |
2023-08-10 | House | To Governor 8/10/23 |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 103) |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 102) |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2023-08-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-08-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-08-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 815) |
2023-08-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 814) |
2023-08-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-08-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-08-06 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 813) |
2023-08-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-08-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-08-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 3D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |