WV HB127 | 2023 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-08 - Placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-08 - Placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of supplemental appropriation bill is to supplement, amend and increase existing items of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2024.
Title
Supplementing, amending and increasing existing items of appropriation from the State Road Fund to the Department of Transportation, Division of Highways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-08-08 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-08-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-08-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-08-07 | House | Do pass |
2023-08-06 | House | To House Finance |
2023-08-06 | House | Committed to Finance on 2nd reading |
2023-08-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-08-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-08-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-08-06 | House | To Finance |
2023-08-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1027 (Similar To) 2023-08-29 - Chapter 13, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023