WV HB117 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to legislatively mandate or authorize for the promulgation of certain legislative rules by various executive or administrative agencies of the state; to repeal certain legislative, procedural or interpretive rules promulgated by certain agencies, boards and commissions which are no longer authorized or are obsolete; and to repeal certain legislative, procedural and interpretive rules promulgated by certain agencies and boards under the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
Relating generally to the promulgation of administrative rules by the Department of Environmental Protection
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 15) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 696) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 695) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 694) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 15) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 696) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 695) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 694) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/8/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-11 | House | Approved by Governor 6/8/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-08 | House | Approved by Governor 6/8/16 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | To Governor 6/7/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-11 | House | To Governor 6/7/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-07 | House | To Governor 6/7/16 |
2016-06-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 15) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-02 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 696) |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 695) |
2016-06-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-02 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 694) |
2016-06-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-02 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-06-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-06-01 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-01 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-06-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-06-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-06-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1009 (Similar To) 2016-06-01 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |