WV HB115 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is related to the appointment of counsel and general changes in abuse and neglect proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to court actions in abuse and neglect proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 46) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 46) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 45) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 770) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 769) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 768) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateApproved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
2019-05-29HouseApproved by Governor 5/29/19
2019-06-01SenateTo Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal
2019-05-24HouseTo Governor 5/24/19
2019-05-20HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-05-20SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-05-20SenateCommunicated to House
2019-05-20SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 46)
2019-05-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 46)
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-20SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 45)
2019-05-20SenateRead 1st time
2019-05-20SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2019-05-20SenateImmediate consideration
2019-05-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-05-20HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-05-20HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 770)
2019-05-20HousePassed House (Roll No. 769)
2019-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 768)
2019-05-20HouseRead 1st time
2019-05-20HouseImmediate consideration
2019-05-20HouseReference dispensed
2019-05-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1008 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - To Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
494601Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback