WI SJR90 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending the Legislative Audit Bureau on the occasion of its 50th year of service to the legislature.
Title
Commending the Legislative Audit Bureau on the occasion of its 50th year of service to the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | C. Larson, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Gudex, Harris Dodd, Harsdorf, Kapenga, L. Taylor, Lasee, LeMahieu, Marklein, Moulton, Nass, Olsen, Petrowski, Ringhand, Risser, Roth, S. Fitzgerald, Shilling, Stroebel, Tiffany, Vukmir, Wanggaard and Wirch of the Senate added as coauthors |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |