WI SJR66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-18 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-18 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing October 28, 2019, as First Responders Appreciation Day in Wisconsin.
Title
Recognizing October 28, 2019, as First Responders Appreciation Day in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Concurred in |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Senators Larson and Darling added as coauthors |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |