WI SJR58 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: applying to Congress under Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention to propose an amendment providing that the Supreme Court of the United States shall be composed of 9 justices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applying to Congress under Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention to propose an amendment providing that the Supreme Court of the United States shall be composed of 9 justices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21SenatePlaced on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2022-01-05SenateRepresentative Ramthun withdrawn as a cosponsor
2021-11-04SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-11-04SenateReport adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-11-04SenateExecutive action taken
2021-10-26SenatePublic hearing held
2021-09-01SenateRepresentative Penterman added as a cosponsor
2021-08-18SenateRepresentative Schraa added as a cosponsor
2021-08-11SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
2021-08-11SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback