WI SJR58 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending Laura Kaeppeler on winning the Miss America pageant.
Title
Commending Laura Kaeppeler on winning the Miss America pageant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-16-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2012-03-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |