WI SJR3 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming February 20 to 26, 2023, as American Birkebeiner Week in Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming February 20 to 26, 2023, as American Birkebeiner Week in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-01-19 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-01-19 | House | Concurred in |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-01-17 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |