WI SJR3 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: terminating the COVID-19 public health emergency, including all emergency orders and actions taken pursuant to declaration of the public health emergency.
Title
Terminating the COVID-19 public health emergency, including all emergency orders and actions taken pursuant to declaration of the public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - Assembly: Concurred in (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-5-2021 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-01-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-01-28 | House | Concurred in, Ayes 52, Noes 42, Paired 2 |
2021-01-26 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:03 AM on 1-28-2021 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 8 |
2021-01-26 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-01-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 18, Noes 13 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-26-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Representative Kuglitsch added as a cosponsor |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |