WI SJR14 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: declaring March 5, 2023, to March 11, 2023, as Women in Construction Week and celebrating the countless contributions of women in construction.
Title
Declaring March 5, 2023, to March 11, 2023, as Women in Construction Week and celebrating the countless contributions of women in construction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |