WI SB999 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 77.81 (1) and 77.83 (1m); to amend 77.83 (2) (c); and to create 20.395 (1) (mr), 77.81 (1c), 77.81 (3m), 77.81 (5g), 77.81 (7), 77.81 (8), 77.83 (1m) (b), 77.83 (2) (d) and 85.65 of the statutes; Relating to: vehicle access to roads and trails on open managed forest land, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Vehicle access to roads and trails on open managed forest land, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Sen. Rob Stafsholt [R] | Rep. Chanz Green [R] |
Rep. Peter Schmidt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |