WI SB954 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.257 (3) and 165.29; to amend 59.54 (29), 66.0511 (title) and 165.85 (4) (ef); and to create 15.257 (3), 59.54 (29), 66.0511 (4), 165.25 (21), 165.29, 165.85 (3m) (d), 165.85 (4) (a) 7. d. and 165.85 (4) (ef) of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a Human Trafficking Council and requiring the establishment of county sex trafficking task forces. (FE)
Title
Creation of a Human Trafficking Council and requiring the establishment of county sex trafficking task forces. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |