WI SB902 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: FoodShare work and FoodShare employment and training requirements and drug testing.
Title
FoodShare work and FoodShare employment and training requirements and drug testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic and Workforce Development, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic and Workforce Development |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |