WI SB89 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 74.41 (2) (a); to renumber and amend 71.255 (2) (c), 71.34 (1k) (h), 125.02 (18), 139.11 (4) (a) and 196.025 (6) (d) 2.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 196.025 (6) (d) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 70.52, 71.05 (25) (a) 2., 71.255 (7) (b) 7., 74.41 (2) (intro.), 74.41 (2) (b), 77.51 (5), 77.51 (11d), 77.54 (30) (a) 6., 77.70, 77.76 (3), 77.82 (8), 77.98 (3), 77.98 (4) (a), 125.29 (6), 139.38 (6), 139.82 (6), 177.24 (3) (a), 196.025 (6) (b) 1., 196.025 (6) (b) 2., 196.025 (6) (c) 2., 565.02 (1) (c), 565.02 (2) (d), 565.25 (4) and 565.30 (5); and to create 71.05 (25) (a) 1m., 71.05 (26) (a) 2m., 71.255 (2) (c) 2., 71.255 (2) (c) 3., 71.34 (1k) (h) 1., 71.34 (1k) (h) 2., 74.41 (2) (bm), 77.51 (13) (fm), 77.51 (17g), 77.52 (2m) (am), 77.52 (4), 77.54 (30) (g), 77.54 (64), 125.02 (18) (a) to (h), 139.11 (4) (a) 2., 177.24 (3) (c), 196.025 (6) (cm), 565.01 (6p), 565.17 (1m) and 565.40 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: tax administration changes, the police and fire protection fee, defining restaurant for purposes of alcohol beverage regulation, lottery ticket couriers, background investigations of persons associated with the lottery, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Tax administration changes, the police and fire protection fee, defining restaurant for purposes of alcohol beverage regulation, lottery ticket couriers, background investigations of persons associated with the lottery, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Published 6-22-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-21-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 17 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-20-2017 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 62, Noes 34 |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 34 |
2017-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca and Hebl |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 8 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions withdrawn pursuant to Senate Rule 36 (2)(c) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |