WI SB886 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 323.225 of the statutes; Relating to: emergency power to regulate businesses.
Title
Emergency power to regulate businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Representatives Macco and Magnafici added as cosponsors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |