WI SB885 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (7) (bm) and 146.619 of the statutes; Relating to: grants for patient lift devices and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for patient lift devices and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Representatives C. Anderson and Schmidt added as cosponsors |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |