WI SB866 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Published 3-15-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Published 3-15-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 287.17 (10) (c) 1. a.; to renumber and amend 287.17 (4) (d) 1.; to amend 287.17 (1) (j), 287.17 (4) (b) 1., 287.17 (4) (b) 2., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. a., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. b., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. c. and 287.17 (10) (c) 2.; and to create 287.17 (4) (d) 1. b. and 287.17 (4) (g) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: changes to the electronic waste recycling program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Changes to the electronic waste recycling program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Sen. Jesse James [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 108 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | LRB correction |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:46 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Introduced |