WI SB863 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 25.18 (1) (o) and (p); to renumber and amend 25.167 and 25.187 (1); to amend 25.156 (3) and (4), 25.16 (2) and (3), 25.165 (2) (c), 25.17 (3) (b) 3., 25.17 (3) (dg) 2., 25.17 (70) (intro.), 25.18 (1) (intro.), (a), (f) and (m) and 25.183 (3); and to create 25.167 (2m), 25.187 (1) (b) and (c) and 25.187 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: investment board operations.
Title
Investment board operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-12-2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 177 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:05 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |