WI SB859 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.08 (1) (intro.), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g) and 238.12 (1); and to create 20.835 (2) (cq), 71.07 (3ym), 71.28 (3ym), 77.54 (67) and 238.165 of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing certain tax benefits for a paper products manufacturer with facilities in the city of Neenah and village of Fox Crossing and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Authorizing certain tax benefits for a paper products manufacturer with facilities in the city of Neenah and village of Fox Crossing and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Rep. Jim Steineke [R] | Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb859 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB859.pdf |