WI SB817 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 121.91 (7); and to create 121.91 (4) (m) of the statutes; Relating to: a school district revenue limit adjustment for the cost of unfunded state mandates on school districts. (FE)
Title
A school district revenue limit adjustment for the cost of unfunded state mandates on school districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |